MN SF3560 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-17 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus health and human services policy bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus health and human services policy bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-16 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 80 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - House - House: 53 - Amend the Garofalo amendment as amended - Nays (Y: 81 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - House - House: 81 - Amend, Garofalo Amendment - Nays (Y: 53 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-17SenateLaid on table
2020-05-17SenateReturned from House with amendment
2020-05-16HouseBill was passed as amended
2020-05-16HouseThird reading as amended
2020-05-16HouseAmended
2020-05-16HouseTaken from table
2020-05-13HouseLaid on table
2020-05-13HouseMotion to lay on the table
2020-05-11HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 13, 2020
2020-05-11HouseSecond reading
2020-05-11HouseJoint rule 2.03 waived
2020-05-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2020-05-09HouseSenate file first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2020-05-09HouseReceived from Senate
2020-05-07SenateThird reading Passed
2020-05-07SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2020-05-06SenateSecond reading
2020-05-06SenateComm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended
2020-05-04SenateJoint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
2020-05-04SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2020-02-24SenateReferred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2020-02-24SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF3727 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF3560&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF3560&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2020&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF3560&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2020&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF3560&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2020&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mn/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=6442
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF3560&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10621
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF3560&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10622
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF3560&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10623

Bill Comments

feedback