MN SF3488 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Author added Kiffmeyer
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Author added Kiffmeyer
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health care provider medical records request requirement specification
Title
Health care provider medical records request requirement specification
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Dahms [R] | Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [D] | Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] |
Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Author added Kiffmeyer |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3582 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy