MN SF3481 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2016 - 75% progression
Action: 2016-05-22 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Controlled substance crimes thresholds modifications; marijuana plants and controlled substance trace amounts possession new offenses creation; lower level controlled substance crimes mandatory minimum sentences elimination; community justice reinvestment account establishment; appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substance crimes thresholds modifications; marijuana plants and controlled substance trace amounts possession new offenses creation; lower level controlled substance crimes mandatory minimum sentences elimination; community justice reinvestment account establishment; appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-20 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-22 Governor approval
2016-05-22 Governor's action Approval
2016-05-22 Presented to Governor
2016-05-21SenateReturned from House
2016-05-20HouseBill was passed vote: 129-0
2016-05-20HouseThird reading
2016-05-20HouseRules suspended, urgency declared
2016-05-20HouseSecond reading
2016-05-20HouseMotion prevailed
2016-05-20HouseMotion to recall pursuant to House rule 4.30
2016-05-16HouseSenate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance
2016-05-16HouseReceived from Senate
2016-05-16SenateThird reading Passed vote: 45-19
2016-05-16SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2016-05-11SenateSecond reading
2016-05-11SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2016-05-04SenateJoint rule 2.03 Suspended adopt previous committee report
2016-04-11SenateJoint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
2016-04-11SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2016-04-07SenateReferred to Judiciary
2016-04-07SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF3983 (Similar To) 2016-05-04 - Author added Zerwas.

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF3481&ssn=0&y=2015
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF3481&version=0&session=ls89&session_year=2016&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF3481&version=1&session=ls89&session_year=2016&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF3481&version=2&session=ls89&session_year=2016&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF3481&version=3&session=ls89&session_year=2016&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls89&number=7033
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=89&billnum=SF3481&session_number=0&year=2015&id=20618

Bill Comments

feedback