MN SF347 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ignition interlock performance standards modification and devices enabled with location tracking capabilities use prohibition
Title
Ignition interlock performance standards modification and devices enabled with location tracking capabilities use prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Dan Hall [R] |
Sen. Scott Newman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF179 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Chief author added Limmer |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Latz |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Author added Newman |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF179 (Similar To) 2017-05-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 83