MN SF3420 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - HF substituted on General Orders HF1333
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - HF substituted on General Orders HF1333
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Spousal maintenance modification based on obligee cohabitation authorization
Title
Spousal maintenance modification based on obligee cohabitation authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Benson [R] | Sen. David Osmek [R] | Sen. Eric Pratt [R] | Sen. Kathleen Sheran [D] |
Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF1333 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with HF1333 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Authors added Pratt; Sheran; Gazelka |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Author added Osmek |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1333 (Similar To) 2016-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 132 05/19/16