MN SF342 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF554
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF554
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Parent petition for reestablishment of the legal parent and child relationship authorization
Title
Parent petition for reestablishment of the legal parent and child relationship authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF554 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Author added Limmer |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF554 (Similar To) 2019-05-06 - Secretary of State Chapter 14 05/06/2019