MN SF3313 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Collateral Consequences of Conviction Model Act
Title
Collateral Consequences of Conviction Model Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Author added Oumou Verbeten |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3310 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Author added Hanson, J.