MN SF3307 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Miscellaneous oversights, inconsistencies, ambiguities, unintended results, and technical errors corrected
Title
Miscellaneous oversights, inconsistencies, ambiguities, unintended results, and technical errors corrected
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2023-05-26 | Governor approval | |
2023-05-26 | Secretary of State Chapter 69 | |
2023-05-26 | Governor's action Approval | |
2023-05-23 | Presented to Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Third reading |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2023-05-22 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2023-05-22 | House | Third reading as amended |
2023-05-22 | House | Amended |
2023-05-20 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 22, 2023 |
2023-05-19 | House | Second reading |
2023-05-19 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2023-05-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2023-05-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Special Order |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Author added Limmer |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Rules and Administration |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3280 (Similar To) 2023-04-21 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration