MN SF3301 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Minnesota housing tax credit contribution fund, income tax credit and appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minnesota housing tax credit contribution fund, income tax credit and appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
2018-03-26SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance
2018-03-19SenateWithdrawn and re-referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy
2018-03-15SenateAuthor added Dziedzic
2018-03-14SenateReferred to Taxes
2018-03-14SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF4072 (Similar To) 2018-05-02 - Author added Peterson.

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback