MN SF3297 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
St. Paul McCarron's treatment process improvements project design-build process authorization
Title
St. Paul McCarron's treatment process improvements project design-build process authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: Passage (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-20 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 189 | |
2018-05-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-19 | Senate | Returned from House |
2018-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-18 | House | Bill was passed vote: 120-0 |
2018-05-18 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-16 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-16 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on Calendar for the Day |
2018-05-15 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3838 |
2018-05-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 66-0 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Author added Relph |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3838 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - HF indefinitely postponed