MN SF3287 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Department enforcement powers modification
Title
Department enforcement powers modification
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Dahms [R] | Sen. Eric Pratt [R] | Sen. Thomas Bakk [I] | Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] |
Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2022-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3607 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means