MN SF327 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Military pay or benefits assignment prohibition and penalties and remedies
Title
Military pay or benefits assignment prohibition and penalties and remedies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-20 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 174 | |
2018-05-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Returned from House |
2018-05-16 | House | Bill was passed vote: 128-0 |
2018-05-16 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-09 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on Calendar for the Day |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF368 |
2018-05-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 64-0 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Special Order |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-02-23 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF368 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - HF indefinitely postponed