MN SF3250 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle titling and registration provisions modifications
Title
Motor vehicle titling and registration provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. John Jasinski [R] | Sen. Scott Newman [R] | Sen. Scott Jensen [R] | Sen. Susan Kent [D] |
Sen. Mark Koran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3463 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 206