MN SF3242 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-21 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3775
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-21 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3775
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Registration filing modification for franchises
Title
Registration filing modification for franchises
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Dahms [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-21 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3775 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3775 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Secretary of State Chapter 91