MN SF3204 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health care services utilization review and prior authorization requirements modification
Title
Health care services utilization review and prior authorization requirements modification
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Scott Jensen [R] | Sen. Karin Housley [R] |
Sen. Michelle Benson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-17 - House - House: S. F. No. 3204 (Y: 123 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-27 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State Chapter 114 | |
2020-05-27 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Returned from House |
2020-05-17 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-17 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-17 | House | Amendments offered |
2020-05-17 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-05-17 | House | Motion for reconsideration of third reading |
2020-05-17 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-05-17 | House | Motion for reconsideration of passage |
2020-05-17 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-17 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 17, 2020 |
2020-05-15 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-15 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-14 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3398 |
2020-05-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3398 (Similar To) 2020-05-16 - Author added Cantrell