MN SF315 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture laboratory equipment and instruments appropriation
Title
Agriculture laboratory equipment and instruments appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF284 (Similar To) 2017-01-26 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means