MN SF3125 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-28 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-28 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical assistance (MA) coverage for routine patient costs incurred in qualified clinical trials
Title
Medical assistance (MA) coverage for routine patient costs incurred in qualified clinical trials
Sponsors
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] | Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | House | Second reading |
2020-04-28 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-04-17 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3026 |
2020-04-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Authors added Abeler; Hoffman |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3026 (Similar To) 2020-04-28 - HF indefinitely postponed