MN SF3073 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative commission on data practices and personal data privacy expiration delay and appropriation
Title
Legislative commission on data practices and personal data privacy expiration delay and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2020-02-27 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3011 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Author added Scott