MN SF307 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Secretary of State Chapter 6 04/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Secretary of State Chapter 6 04/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disaster contingency account funds transfer
Title
Disaster contingency account funds transfer
Sponsors
Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Jason Isaacson [D] | Sen. Erik Simonson [D] | Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
Sen. Mark Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: Jurgens - Amendment - S0307A1 (Y: 47 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: Jurgens - Amendment - S0307A1 (Y: 47 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Secretary of State Chapter 6 04/01/2019 | |
2019-04-03 | Governor's action Approval 04/01/2019 | |
2019-04-01 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-04-01 | Governor approval | |
2019-04-01 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned from House |
2019-03-28 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-03-28 | House | Third reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Amendments offered |
2019-03-27 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-25 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-03-21 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF682 |
2019-03-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Authors added Pratt; Johnson |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Author added Simonson |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF345 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred by Chair to Greater Minnesota Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division