MN SF3031 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - HF substituted on General Orders HF3333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - HF substituted on General Orders HF3333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled substances schedules modifications
Title
Controlled substances schedules modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Chris Eaton [D] | Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Dan Hall [R] |
Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF3333 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with HF3333 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Judiciary |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3333 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Secretary of State Chapter 182