MN SF3031 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF3336
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF3336
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eminent domain right of first refusal modification for property obtained with federal transit funding
Title
Eminent domain right of first refusal modification for property obtained with federal transit funding
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Bakk [I] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Mee Moua [D] | Sen. Julianne Ortman [R] |
Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF3336 | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Comm report: To pass | |
2010-03-18 | Senate: Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Transportation | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Moua | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Chief author added Pappas | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Referred to Judiciary |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=Senate&f=SF3031&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/data/senate/bills/ls86/3000/S3031.0.pdf |