MN SF3003 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Vocational services for individuals with disabilities
Title
Vocational services for individuals with disabilities
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. Jerry Relph [R] |
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to E-12 Finance and Policy |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Author added Relph |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2971 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Author added Lillie