MN SF300 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Author added Clausen
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Author added Clausen
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical practice board physician criminal background checks authorization and exemption
Title
Medical practice board physician criminal background checks authorization and exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. Consent Calendar HF474 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass, Consent Calendar |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF474 (Similar To) 2017-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 50 05/12/17