MN SF2938 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-14 - Author added Champion
Pending: Senate Environment, Climate, and Legacy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-14 - Author added Champion
Pending: Senate Environment, Climate, and Legacy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hong De Wu Guan appropriation
Title
Hong De Wu Guan appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Mitchell [D] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
Sen. Bobby Champion [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | Senate | Author added Champion |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3061 (Similar To) 2023-04-17 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger