MN SF2912 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 303 05/11/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 303 05/11/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Children's mental health policy provisions modifications; American Indian chemical dependency licensure programs requirements modifications; mental health diagnostic assessment payments structure modifications
Title
Children's mental health policy provisions modifications; American Indian chemical dependency licensure programs requirements modifications; mental health diagnostic assessment payments structure modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Secretary of State Chapter 303 05/11/10 | |
2010-05-12 | Governor's action Approval 05/11/10 | |
2010-05-11 | Governor approval | |
2010-05-07 | Presented to Governor | |
2010-05-07 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-05 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-05 | House: Third reading as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-05 | House: House adopted conference committee report | |
2010-05-05 | House: Conference committee report | |
2010-05-05 | House: Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed | |
2010-05-05 | Senate: House adopted SCC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-03 | Senate: Third reading | |
2010-05-03 | Senate: Conference committee report | |
2010-05-03 | Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill | |
2010-04-19 | Senate: House conferees Hosch; Gardner; Mack | |
2010-04-15 | House: House conferees Hosch, Gardner, Mack | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Senate conferees Berglin; Koering; Lynch | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Returned from House with amendment | |
2010-04-13 | House: House accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed | |
2010-04-13 | House: Senate conferees Berglin, Koering, Lynch | |
2010-04-13 | House: Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2010-04-12 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2010-04-12 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2010-04-12 | House: Amended | |
2010-04-07 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-04-06 | House: Second reading | |
2010-04-06 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register | |
2010-03-29 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2926 | |
2010-03-29 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Referred to Health, Housing and Family Security |