MN SF2904 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus Environment policy bill
Title
Omnibus Environment policy bill
Sponsors
Sen. Foung Hawj [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 72 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Heintzeman - Amendment - S2904A5 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 72 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Heintzeman - Amendment - S2904A5 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2024-04-26 | Governor approval | |
2024-04-26 | Secretary of State Chapter 90 | |
2024-04-26 | Governor's action Approval | |
2024-04-25 | Presented to Governor | |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2024-04-15 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2024-04-15 | House | Third reading as amended |
2024-04-15 | House | Amended |
2024-04-11 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-05-01 | House | Second reading |
2023-05-01 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2023-04-27 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2774 |
2023-04-27 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2774 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - HF indefinitely postponed