MN SF2887 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Electric and plug-in hybrid electric vehicles barriers to state agencies purchase elimination; state SmartFleet requirements and report
Title
Electric and plug-in hybrid electric vehicles barriers to state agencies purchase elimination; state SmartFleet requirements and report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-15 - House - House: Passage (Y: 119 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-05-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 281 | |
2014-05-16 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-15 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Returned from House |
2014-05-15 | House | Bill was passed vote: 119-10 |
2014-05-15 | House | Third reading |
2014-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 15, 2014 |
2014-04-29 | House | Second reading |
2014-04-29 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-04-28 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2849 |
2014-04-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 58-0 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |