MN SF2881 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-22 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-22 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer-directed community support budget methodology existing exception sunset extension
Title
Consumer-directed community support budget methodology existing exception sunset extension
Sponsors
Sen. James Carlson [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. John Marty [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2016-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 144 | |
2016-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2016-05-19 | Presented to Governor | |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Returned from House |
2016-05-18 | House | Bill was passed vote: 126-0 |
2016-05-18 | House | Third reading |
2016-05-16 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | House | Second reading |
2016-05-12 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2016-05-11 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 3276 |
2016-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 57-0 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Special Order |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3276 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - HF indefinitely postponed