MN SF2852 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-21 - Authors added Osmek; Coleman
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-21 - Authors added Osmek; Coleman
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Qualified domestic violence-related offenses definition amendment to include additional crimes
Title
Qualified domestic violence-related offenses definition amendment to include additional crimes
Sponsors
Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. David Osmek [R] |
Sen. Julia Coleman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Senate | Authors added Osmek; Coleman |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3049 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Author added Poston