MN SF2839 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Commerce and insurance provisions modifications; securities regulations; real estate broker, salespersons and closing agents modifications; real estate appraiser advisory board modifications; workers compensation self-insurers provisions modifications; flexible benefit health plan authorization; university promise scholarship modification; certain on-sale liquor licenses authorization
Title
Commerce and insurance provisions modifications; securities regulations; real estate broker, salespersons and closing agents modifications; real estate appraiser advisory board modifications; workers compensation self-insurers provisions modifications; flexible benefit health plan authorization; university promise scholarship modification; certain on-sale liquor licenses authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-05-18 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-15 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-15 | House: Third reading as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-15 | House: House adopted conference committee report | |
2010-05-15 | House: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2010-05-15 | House: Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: House adopted SCC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Third reading | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-14 | House: House conferees Atkins, Lillie, Hoppe | |
2010-05-14 | House: House accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed | |
2010-05-14 | House: Senate conferees Scheid, Pappas, Michel | |
2010-05-14 | House: Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2010-05-14 | Senate: House conferees Akins; Lillie; Hoppe | |
2010-05-14 | Senate: Senate conferees Scheid; Pappas; Michel | |
2010-05-14 | Senate: Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2010-05-14 | Senate: Returned from House with amendment | |
2010-05-13 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2010-05-13 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2010-05-13 | House: Point of order raised, ruled well taken | |
2010-05-13 | House: Amended | |
2010-05-11 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-05-11 | House: Second reading | |
2010-05-11 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register | |
2010-05-10 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2942 | |
2010-05-10 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-05-08 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed Rules suspended, lie-over waived | |
2010-05-07 | Senate: General Orders: To pass as amended | |
2010-04-15 | Senate: Author added Prettner Solon | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |