MN SF2774 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Author added Hayden
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Author added Hayden
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Human services program integrity provisions modification and appropriation
Title
Human services program integrity provisions modification and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Senate | Author added Hayden |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2319 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Health and Human Services Finance Division