MN SF277 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Senate file first reading, referred to Commerce
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Senate file first reading, referred to Commerce
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Direct primary care service agreements establishment
Title
Direct primary care service agreements establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Jensen [R] | Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Michelle Benson [R] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] |
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Commerce |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1126 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce