MN SF2725 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Violent crime coordinating council establishment; multijurisdictional gang and drug task forces certification process establishment; criminal gang investigative data system audit requirements modification; comprehensive incident-based reporting system data delineation; forfeiture requirements application
Title
Violent crime coordinating council establishment; multijurisdictional gang and drug task forces certification process establishment; criminal gang investigative data system audit requirements modification; comprehensive incident-based reporting system data delineation; forfeiture requirements application
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Higgins [D] | Sen. Mee Moua [D] | Rep. Mark Olson [R] | Sen. Linda Scheid [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-05-18 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-15 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-15 | House: Third reading as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-15 | House: House adopted conference committee report | |
2010-05-15 | House: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2010-05-15 | House: Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: House adopted SCC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Third reading | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Motion did not prevail To reject conference committee report | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-13 | Senate: House conferees Paymar; Hilstrom; Lesch; Champion; Holberg | |
2010-05-12 | House: House conferees Paymar, Hilstrom, Lesch, Champion, Holberg | |
2010-05-12 | House: House accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed | |
2010-05-12 | House: Senate conferees Moua, Dibble, Torres Ray, Chaudhary, Koering | |
2010-05-12 | House: Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested | |
2010-05-12 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2010-05-12 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2010-05-12 | House: Amended | |
2010-05-12 | Senate: Senate conferees Moua; Dibble; Torres Ray; Chaudhary; Koering | |
2010-05-12 | Senate: Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested | |
2010-05-12 | Senate: Returned from House with amendment | |
2010-05-11 | House: Second reading | |
2010-05-11 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF subbed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-05-10 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2965 | |
2010-05-10 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-05-08 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed Rules suspended, lie-over waived | |
2010-05-07 | Senate: General Orders: To pass as amended | |
2010-04-19 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-04-19 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: Comm report: Amended | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: Comm report: No recommendation, re-referred to Finance | |
2010-03-18 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government Operations and Oversight | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Referred to Judiciary |