MN SF2651 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-19 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-19 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
St. Louis County civil service commission technical modifications
Title
St. Louis County civil service commission technical modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-19 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-19 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-18 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3076 |
2018-05-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 61-0 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3076 (Similar To) 2018-05-19 - HF indefinitely postponed