MN SF2639 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Full subtraction of taxable Social Security benefits for veterans and surviving spouses addition
Title
Full subtraction of taxable Social Security benefits for veterans and surviving spouses addition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3096 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Author added Davids