MN SF2620 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus retirement bill
Title
Omnibus retirement bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-20 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-20 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-31 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-31 | Secretary of State Chapter 211 | |
2018-05-31 | Governor's action Approval Chapter 211 | |
2018-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 67-0 |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2018-05-20 | House | Bill was passed vote: 131-0 |
2018-05-20 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-18 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 20, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-05-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2018-05-09 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2018-05-08 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2018-05-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2018-03-26 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2018-03-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 66-0 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Author added Jasinski |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3053 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy