MN SF2593 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Senate: Comm report: Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Senate: Comm report: Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Environmentally sensitive cleaning products public buildings use requirement
Title
Environmentally sensitive cleaning products public buildings use requirement
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Anderson [R] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Sen. Tom Saxhaug [D] | Sen. Katie Sieben [D] |
Sen. Patricia Torres Ray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Senate: Comm report: Amended | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Comm report: No recommendation, re-referred to State and Local Government Operations and Oversight | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Withdrawn and re-referred to Health, Housing and Family Security | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Environment and Natural Resources |