MN SF2578 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Controlled substance schedules modification; kratom criminal penalties; DWI law modification and conformance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substance schedules modification; kratom criminal penalties; DWI law modification and conformance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Motion to reject CC report, did not prevail (Y: 33 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 123 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29 Secretary of State, Filed
2018-05-29 Governor approval
2018-05-29 Secretary of State Chapter 195
2018-05-29 Governor's action Approval
2018-05-19 Presented to Governor
2018-05-19SenateHouse adopted SCC report and repassed bill
2018-05-18HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 116-5
2018-05-18HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2018-05-18HouseHouse adopted conference committee report
2018-05-18HouseConference committee report, delete everything
2018-05-18HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 47-20
2018-05-18SenateThird reading vote: 47-20
2018-05-18SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2018-05-18SenateMotion to reject CC report, did not prevail vote: 33-34
2018-05-18SenateConference committee report, delete everything
2018-05-16SenateHouse conferees Franke; Wills; Hilstrom
2018-05-15HouseHouse conferees Franke, Wills, and Hilstrom.
2018-05-15HouseHouse accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed
2018-05-15HouseSenate conferees Anderson, P.; Limmer; Latz
2018-05-15HouseSenate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2018-05-15SenateSenate conferees Anderson, P.; Limmer; Latz
2018-05-14SenateSenate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2018-05-14SenateReturned from House with amendment
2018-05-10HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 123-3
2018-05-10HouseThird reading as amended
2018-05-10HouseAmended
2018-05-08HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 10, 2018
2018-05-07HouseSecond reading
2018-05-07HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2018-05-03HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3479
2018-05-03HouseReceived from Senate
2018-05-02SenateThird reading Passed vote: 62-4
2018-05-02SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2018-03-14SenateAuthor added Clausen
2018-03-08SenateSecond reading
2018-03-08SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2018-02-22SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF3479 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Author added Wills.

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF2578&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF2578&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF2578&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF2578&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF2578&version=3&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=8531
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF2578&session_number=0&year=2017&id=531
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=9366
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=9365
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF2578&session_number=0&year=2017&id=610

Bill Comments

feedback