MN SF2575 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Author added Laine
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Redistricting commission to recommend boundaries of legislative and congressional districts appointment requirement; districting principles for legislative and congressional plans establishment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redistricting commission to recommend boundaries of legislative and congressional districts appointment requirement; districting principles for legislative and congressional plans establishment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateAuthor added Laine
2019-03-25SenateAuthor added Abeler
2019-03-20SenateReferred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2019-03-20SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1605 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Author added Davnie

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback