MN SF2535 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - House: Senate file first reading, referred to Commerce and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - House: Senate file first reading, referred to Commerce and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cable communications franchise granting requirements clarification
Title
Cable communications franchise granting requirements clarification
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Dahle [D] | Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Yvonne Prettner Solon [D] | Sen. Claire Robling [R] |
Sen. Sandy Rummel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | House: Senate file first reading, referred to Commerce and Labor | |
2010-03-29 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State and Local Government Operations and Oversight | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Authors added Dahle; Rummel | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Energy, Utilities, Technology and Communications |