MN SF2527 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Outdoor heritage fund and clean water fund appropriations and prior appropriations modifications; Lessard-Sams outdoor heritage council provisions modifications; White Bear Lake augmentation authorization; legacy fund provisions modifications; prior arts and cultural heritage appropriations modifications
Title
Outdoor heritage fund and clean water fund appropriations and prior appropriations modifications; Lessard-Sams outdoor heritage council provisions modifications; White Bear Lake augmentation authorization; legacy fund provisions modifications; prior arts and cultural heritage appropriations modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-21 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 100 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 45 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 87 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 54 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 55 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 45 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 87 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 54 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 55 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2016-05-31 | Secretary of State Chapter 172 | |
2016-05-31 | Governor's action Approval | |
2016-05-24 | Presented to Governor | |
2016-05-22 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2016-05-21 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 100-29 |
2016-05-21 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2016-05-21 | House | Motion prevailed |
2016-05-21 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2016-05-21 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2016-05-21 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 45-10 |
2016-05-21 | Senate | Third reading vote: 45-10 |
2016-05-21 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2016-05-21 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2016-05-12 | Senate | House conferees Urdahl; McNamara; Torkelson; Heintzeman; Lillie |
2016-05-11 | House | House conferees Urdahl, McNamara, Torkelson, Heintzeman, Lillie |
2016-05-11 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2016-05-11 | House | Senate conferees Saxhaug, Sparks, Lourey, Ingebrigtsen, Cohen |
2016-05-11 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate conferees Saxhaug; Sparks; Lourey; Ingebrigtsen; Cohen |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2016-05-09 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 87-42 |
2016-05-09 | House | Third reading as amended |
2016-05-09 | House | Amended |
2016-05-05 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 09, 2016 |
2016-05-05 | House | Second reading |
2016-05-05 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 3829 |
2016-05-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 48-16 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Special Order |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2611 (Similar To) 2016-03-17 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Legacy Funding Finance