MN SF250 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 65 05/16/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 65 05/16/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Preadoptive and adoptive Indian child placement proceedings expansion
Title
Preadoptive and adoptive Indian child placement proceedings expansion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-10 - House - House: Passage (Y: 123 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 65 05/16/13 | |
2013-05-18 | Governor's action Approval 05/16/13 | |
2013-05-16 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2013-05-16 | Governor approval | |
2013-05-13 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Returned from House |
2013-05-10 | House | Bill was passed vote: 123-5 |
2013-05-10 | House | Third reading |
2013-05-08 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 10, 2013 |
2013-05-03 | House | Second reading |
2013-05-03 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2013-05-02 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 252 |
2013-05-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 50-5 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Special Order |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |