MN SF2479 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Author added Eichorn
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Author added Eichorn
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DWI law modifications to include other types of intoxicating substances
Title
DWI law modifications to include other types of intoxicating substances
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Clausen [D] | Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Dan Hall [R] |
Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Author added Eichorn |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Authors added Limmer; Latz; Hall |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2766 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Author added Scott.