MN SF2466 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement electronic device (cell phone) location information data tracking warrant requirement
Title
Law enforcement electronic device (cell phone) location information data tracking warrant requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-14 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by Conference (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - House: Passage (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - House: Passage (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-05-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 278 | |
2014-05-16 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-15 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-14 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 130-0 |
2014-05-14 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2014-05-14 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2014-05-14 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2014-05-14 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 63-1 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Third reading vote: 63-1 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2014-05-07 | House | House conferees Atkins, Lesch, Cornish |
2014-05-07 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate conferees Petersen, B.; Dibble; Champion |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House conferees Atkins; Lesch; Cornish |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate conferees Petersen B.; Dibble; Champion |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2014-05-02 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 120-0 |
2014-05-02 | House | Third reading as amended |
2014-05-02 | House | Amended |
2014-04-30 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 2, 2014 |
2014-04-25 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 29, 2014 |
2014-04-24 | House | Second reading |
2014-04-24 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-04-23 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2288 |
2014-04-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 56-1 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |