MN SF239 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Draheim
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Draheim
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Manufactured and modular homes provisions modifications
Title
Manufactured and modular homes provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] |
Sen. Rich Draheim [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Author added Draheim |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF282 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Re-referred by committee to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division