MN SF2322 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 240 04/15/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 240 04/15/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Business screening services regulation and criminal record modification
Title
Business screening services regulation and criminal record modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | Secretary of State Chapter 240 04/15/10 | |
2010-04-19 | Governor's action Approval 04/15/10 | |
2010-04-12 | Senate: Returned from House | |
2010-04-12 | Presentment date | |
2010-04-08 | House: Bill was passed | |
2010-04-08 | House: Third reading | |
2010-04-07 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-04-06 | House: Second reading | |
2010-04-06 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register | |
2010-03-29 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3023 | |
2010-03-29 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-03-17 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-17 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Withdrawn and re-referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |