MN SF2279 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative Budget Office authority to order fiscal notes expansion; data classifications for data related to fiscal notes modification; unofficial fiscal notes treatment modification
Title
Legislative Budget Office authority to order fiscal notes expansion; data classifications for data related to fiscal notes modification; unofficial fiscal notes treatment modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2399 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Second reading