MN SF2230 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author stricken Eken
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author stricken Eken
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Beginning farmer tax credits eligibility modification; farmers belonging to protected group tax credit allocation authorization
Title
Beginning farmer tax credits eligibility modification; farmers belonging to protected group tax credit allocation authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Author stricken Eken |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Author stricken Goggin |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Author added Eken |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Author stricken Lang |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1546 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes