MN SF2214 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Author added Hayden
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Author added Hayden
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Expungement of criminal records and eviction records provisions modifications
Title
Expungement of criminal records and eviction records provisions modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Author added Hayden |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Author added Eaton |
2014-04-10 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF2576 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Author added Peterson |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |