MN SF2198 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Author added Tomassoni
Pending: Senate E-12 Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Author added Tomassoni
Pending: Senate E-12 Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Music education online access for rural children and students grant program establishment and appropriation
Title
Music education online access for rural children and students grant program establishment and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] | Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] |
Sen. David Tomassoni [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Author added Tomassoni |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Author added Chamberlain |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to E-12 Finance |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2378 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Author added Jurgens.